+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2016-231), HB 1241 (Ch. 2016-145), SB 586 (Ch. 2016-113)
- Substituted HB 423
- Read 2nd time
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/16
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/18/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Remaining references corrected to Appropriations
- Now in Appropriations
- CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Banking and Insurance
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On October 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (7)
189950 - Amendment
Between lines 233 and 234 insert:
540476 - Substitute Amendment (503040)
Between lines 960 and 961 insert:
503040 - Amendment
Between lines 960 and 961 insert:
243646 - Amendment
Between lines 800 and 801 insert:
821310 - Amendment
Delete lines 928 - 942 and insert:
550786 - Substitute Amendment (391454)
Delete lines 517 - 518 and insert:
391454 - Amendment
Delete line 851 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (39)
- 110.12315 - Prescription drug program.
- 310.071 - Deputy pilot certification.
- 310.073 - State pilot licensing.
- 310.081 - Department to examine and license state pilots and certificate deputy pilots; vacancies.
- 320.0848 - Persons who have disabilities; issuance of disabled parking permits; temporary permits; permits for certain providers of transportation services to persons who have disabilities.
- 383.336 - Provider hospitals; practice parameters; peer review board.
- 395.1051 - Duty to notify patients.
- 456.041 - Practitioner profile; creation.
- 456.072 - Grounds for discipline; penalties; enforcement.
- 456.44 - Controlled substance prescribing.
- 458.303 - Provisions not applicable to other practitioners; exceptions, etc.
- 458.3265 - Pain-management clinics.
- 458.331 - Grounds for disciplinary action; action by the board and department.
- 458.347 - Physician assistants.
- 458.3475 - Anesthesiologist assistants.
- 458.348 - Formal supervisory relationships, standing orders, and established protocols; notice; standards.
- 459.0137 - Pain-management clinics.
- 459.015 - Grounds for disciplinary action; action by the board and department.
- 459.022 - Physician assistants.
- 459.023 - Anesthesiologist assistants.
- 459.025 - Formal supervisory relationships, standing orders, and established protocols; notice; standards.
- 464.003 - Definitions.
- 464.008 - Licensure by examination.
- 464.009 - Licensure by endorsement.
- 464.012 - Certification of advanced registered nurse practitioners; fees.
- 464.013 - Renewal of license or certificate.
- 464.018 - Disciplinary actions.
- 464.0205 - Retired volunteer nurse certificate.
- 465.0158 - Nonresident sterile compounding permit.
- 466.02751 - Establishment of practitioner profile for designation as a controlled substance prescribing practitioner.
- 627.42392 -
- 627.6131 - Payment of claims.
- 641.3155 - Prompt payment of claims.
- 775.051 - Voluntary intoxication; not a defense; evidence not admissible for certain purposes; exception.
- 893.02 - Definitions.
- 944.17 - Commitments and classification; transfers.
- 948.001 - Definitions.
- 948.03 - Terms and conditions of probation.
- 948.101 - Terms and conditions of community control.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 676 Filed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 676 c1
- Yeas: 9
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 676 c2
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor