+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Now in Rules
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/20/18, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On October 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
592426 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2018: Floor vote: S 662 Filed
- Yeas: 10
April 15, 2018: Floor vote: S 662 Filed
- Yeas: 6
April 15, 2018: Floor vote: S 662 c1
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor