+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Commerce and Tourism
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 444.015 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor