+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
- Chapter No. 2020-28
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 98 NAYS 14
- Receded from 1 amendment(s) (370715)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (370715)
- In returning messages
- Requested House to recede
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- In returning messages
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 101 NAYS 14
- Read 3rd time
- Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (370715)
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- In Messages
- Referred to Calendar
- Received
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
- Now in Rules
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
- CS by Education read 1st time
- Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
On October 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Amendments (11)
395416 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/10/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
397254 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/18/2020)
Delete lines 87 - 89 and insert:
815468 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/18/2020)
Between lines 131 and 132 insert:
282524 - Amendment (Withdrawn 2/18/2020)
Delete lines 132 - 134 and insert:
154070 - Amendment to Amendment (282524) (Unfavorable 2/18/2020)
Delete lines 5 - 9 and insert:
566532 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/18/2020)
Delete line 149 and insert:
546942 - Amendment (Senate: Withdrawn 3/9/2020)
Between lines 167 and 168 insert:
172019 - Amendment (House: Withdrawn 3/10/2020)
Remove lines 65-153 and insert:
370715 - Strike All Amendment (House: Recede 3/13/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
886069 - Amendment to Amendment (370715) (House: Withdrawn 3/10/2020)
Between lines 250 and 251, insert:
642757 - Substitute Amendment (370715) (House: Withdrawn 3/10/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (6)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 646 Filed
- Yeas: 8
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 646 c1
- Yeas: 10
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 646 c2
- Yeas: 15
March 13, 2020: Floor vote: S 646 c2
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 14
March 11, 2020: Floor vote: S 646 c2
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 14
March 9, 2020: Floor vote: S 646 c2
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor