+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
671240 - Amendment
Delete lines 46 - 75.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 644 Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor