+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 243 (Ch. 2015-105)
- Substituted CS/HB 243
- Read 2nd time
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
589854 - Amendment
Delete line 75 and insert:
864098 - Amendment
Delete line 75 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 382.002 - Definitions.
- 382.003 - Powers and duties of the department.
- 382.006 - Burial-transit permit.
- 382.007 - Final dispositions prohibited without burial-transit permit; records of dead bodies disposed.
- 382.008 - Death and fetal death registration.
- 382.0085 - Stillbirth registration.
- 382.011 - Medical examiner determination of cause of death.
- 382.0135 - Social security numbers; enumeration-at-birth program.
+ − Votes (3)
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0640 Filed
- Yeas: 9
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0640 c1
- Yeas: 7
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0640 c1
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor