+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3549 (Ch. 2015-217)
- Substituted CS/HB 3549
- Read 2nd time
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
- Now in Fiscal Policy
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/15, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/07/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
- Now in Judiciary
- Recommendation: Unfavorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
On July 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0064 Filed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0064 Filed
- Yeas: 8
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0064 Filed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor