+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/16/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
324466 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/16/2021)
Delete line 51 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
June 1, 2021: Floor vote: S 638 Filed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor