+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2021-115
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (818054)
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Immediately certified
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/21
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Rules read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/06/21, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/16/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/03/21, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
372958 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/7/2021)
Delete lines 25 - 90 and insert:
818054 - Amendment (Senate: Adopted 4/14/2021)
Delete lines 88 - 115 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (5)
July 22, 2021: Floor vote: S 628 Filed
- Yeas: 9
July 22, 2021: Floor vote: S 628 Filed
- Yeas: 9
July 22, 2021: Floor vote: S 628 Filed
- Yeas: 16
April 28, 2021: Floor vote: S 628 e1
- Yeas: 117
April 14, 2021: Floor vote: S 628 c1
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor