+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2014-217)
- Substituted CS/HB 7007
- Read 2nd time
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Now in Rules
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/12/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/06/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/05/14, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
528654 - Amendment
Delete line 29 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 338.155 - Payment of toll on toll facilities required; exemptions.
+ − Votes (3)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0616 Filed
- Yeas: 9
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0616 Filed
- Yeas: 9
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0616 c1
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor