+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1288 (Ch. 2016-198)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/21/16, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/11/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On November 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Tax; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
303126 - Amendment
Delete lines 27 - 111 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 252.359 -
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 608 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 608 c1
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor