+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2013-173
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Substituted for CS/CS/HB 345
- Read 2nd time
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13
- Referred to Calendar
- In Messages
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/09/13, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/13, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/21/13, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
848592 - Amendment
03/20/2013 at 9:59 AM
635678 - Amendment
03/20/2013 at 9:58 AM
816602 - Amendment
03/20/2013 at 9:58 AM
713084 - Amendment
03/20/2013 at 9:57 AM
975722 - Amendment
03/20/2013 at 9:56 AM
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 120.52 - Definitions.
- 343.1001 - Short title.
- 343.1002 - Definitions.
- 343.1003 - Northeast Florida Regional Transportation Commission.
- 343.1004 - Commission powers and duties.
- 343.1005 - Transportation projects of regional significance.
- 343.1006 - Plan coordination with other agencies.
- 343.1008 - Authority to contract.
- 343.1009 - Exemption from taxation and assessment.
- 343.1010 - Powers of commission are supplemental.
- 343.1011 - Public meetings and hearings.
- 343.1012 - Discretionary sales surtax.
- 343.1013 - Repeal.
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2013: House floor vote on S 0606 c1
- Yeas: 118
April 26, 2013: Senate floor vote on S 0606 c1
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (5)
Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor