+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Community Affairs
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
265924 - Amendment (Replaced by Substitute Amendment 1/13/2020)
Between lines 17 and 18 insert:
128390 - Substitute Amendment (265924) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/13/2020)
Between lines 17 and 18 insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 327.4108 - Anchoring of vessels in anchoring limitation areas.
+ − Vote
November 18, 2020: Floor vote: S 606 Filed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor