+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Education read 1st time
- Introduced
On December 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
On December 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On December 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On December 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 12/09/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
174910 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 12/9/2019)
Delete lines 25 - 48 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1004.086 -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor