+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2014-81
- Approved by Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/HB 623
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/14
- Referred to Calendar
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/17/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
- Now in Criminal Justice
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/04/14, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
594286 - Amendment
Delete lines 39 - 40 and insert:
101998 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
+ − Votes (4)
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0590 Filed
- Yeas: 11
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0590 c1
- Yeas: 6
April 22, 2014: Floor vote: S 0590 c2
- Yeas: 119
April 3, 2014: Floor vote: S 0590 c2
- Yeas: 38
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor