+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2021-176
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/26/2021)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (227004, 603772, 693672)
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/30/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Education
- Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/16/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Education; Appropriations
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (8)
832246 - Amendment (Withdrawn 4/20/2021)
Delete lines 79 - 163 and insert:
733110 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/20/2021)
Delete lines 79 - 196 and insert:
867556 - Amendment (Withdrawn 4/20/2021)
Delete lines 121 - 196 and insert:
359110 - Amendment (Replaced by Substitute Amendment 4/20/2021)
Delete lines 333 - 343 and insert:
358862 - Substitute Amendment (359110) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/20/2021)
Delete lines 333 - 343 and insert:
227004 - Amendment (Senate: Adopted 4/22/2021)
Delete lines 97 - 189 and insert:
603772 - Amendment (Senate: Adopted 4/22/2021)
Between lines 341 and 342 insert:
693672 - Amendment (Senate: Adopted 4/22/2021)
Delete lines 443 - 444 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 381.0056 - School health services program.
- 394.463 - Involuntary examination.
- 1001.212 - Office of Safe Schools.
- 1002.20 - K-12 student and parent rights.
- 1002.33 - Charter schools.
- 1006.07 - District school board duties relating to student discipline and school safety.
- 1006.12 - Safe-school officers at each public school.
- 1008.386 - Florida student identification numbers.
- 1011.62 - Funds for operation of schools.
+ − Votes (5)
November 15, 2021: Floor vote: S 590 Filed
- Yeas: 8
November 15, 2021: Floor vote: S 590 Filed
- Yeas: 10
November 15, 2021: Floor vote: S 590 Filed
- Yeas: 18
April 27, 2021: Floor vote: S 590 e1
- Yeas: 116
April 22, 2021: Floor vote: S 590 c1
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor