+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/01/13, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
845078 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Commerce and Tourism
Type:
Primary Sponsor