+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Finance and Tax
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Finance and Tax
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
732174 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 192.0105 - Taxpayer rights.
- 193.073 - Erroneous returns; estimate of assessment when no return filed.
- 193.114 - Preparation of assessment rolls.
- 193.1142 - Approval of assessment rolls.
- 194.011 - Assessment notice; objections to assessments.
- 200.069 - Notice of proposed property taxes and non-ad valorem assessments.
+ − Vote
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 564 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor