+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Banking and Insurance
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor