+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On November 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On October 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/06/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On August 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 212.08 - Sales, rental, use, consumption, distribution, and storage tax; specified exemptions.
+ − Vote
April 4, 2018: Floor vote: S 56 Filed
- Yeas: 8