+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/01/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
- Introduced
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/03/14, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations; Rules
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0552 Filed
- Yeas: 6
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0552 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor