+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
- Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On December 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On November 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On October 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 921.00241 - Prison diversion program.
+ − Vote
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 550 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor