+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2022-99
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- Passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (782315)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 2
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment 782315 adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 411
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediately certified
- Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Now in Rules
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On November 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On November 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Amendment
782315 - Strike All Amendment (Senate: Concurred 3/8/2022)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 448.111 -
+ − Votes (6)
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 542 Filed
- Yeas: 9
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 542 Filed
- Yeas: 10
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 542 Filed
- Yeas: 15
March 8, 2022: Floor vote: S 542 Filed
- Yeas: 39
March 2, 2022: Floor vote: S 542 Filed
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 2
January 27, 2022: Floor vote: S 542 Filed
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor