+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2015-22
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 4007
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
- Received
- Referred to Calendar
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/15
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/19/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Banking and Insurance
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Banking and Insurance; Fiscal Policy
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 218.37 - Powers and duties of Division of Bond Finance; advisory council.
+ − Votes (5)
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0522 Filed
- Yeas: 4
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0522 Filed
- Yeas: 11
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0522 Filed
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2015: Floor vote: S 0522
- Yeas: 114
April 8, 2015: Floor vote: S 0522
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor