+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 522 Filed
- Yeas: 8
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 522 Filed
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor