+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Died in Messages
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- In Messages
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Ordered engrossed
- Amendment(s) adopted (563022)
- Read 2nd time
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/28/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/20/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation read 1st time
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
On December 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On November 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/03/15, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Fiscal Policy
On October 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
563022 - Amendment
Delete lines 225 - 230.
879464 - Amendment
Delete lines 100 - 214 and insert:
368660 - Amendment
Delete lines 73 - 180 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 320.089 - Veterans of the United States Armed Forces; members of National Guard; survivors of Pearl Harbor; Purple Heart medal recipients; active or retired United States Armed Forces reservists; Combat Infantry Badge, Combat Medical Badge, or Combat Action Ba
- 296.11 - Funds of home and disposition of moneys.
- 296.38 - Funds of home and disposition of moneys.
+ − Votes (4)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 518 Filed
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 518 c1
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 518 c1
- Yeas: 10
February 2, 2016: Floor vote: S 518 e1
- Yeas: 36