+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Messages
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/21/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Now in Rules
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 0
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
806688 - Amendment
Between lines 29 and 30 insert:
858972 - Amendment
Delete lines 97 - 100 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 494 Filed
- Yeas: 5
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 494 Filed
- Yeas: 3
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 494 c1
- Yeas: 17
April 25, 2019: Floor vote: S 494 c2
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor