+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/09/21, 11:45 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 16.6171 -
+ − Vote
May 18, 2021: Floor vote: S 492 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor