+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Health Policy
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/16/13, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment 1
Between lines 39 and 40 insert:
410260 - Amendment to Amendment (101366)
04/16/2013 at 12:52 PM
101366 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
243554 - Amendment
Delete line 44 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 409.906 - Optional Medicaid services.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor