+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/13, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/21/13, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 125.01 - Powers and duties.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Type:
Primary Sponsor