+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 04/09/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment 1
Delete line 58 and insert:
520688 - Amendment to Amendment (486936)
04/09/2013 at 11:45 AM
486936 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 253.42 - Board of trustees may exchange lands.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor