+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Messages
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/08/22, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
- Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
521082 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/13/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
501066 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Substitute Amendment 3/1/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
529498 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (501066) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/1/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 6, 2022: Floor vote: S 466 Filed
- Yeas: 7
June 6, 2022: Floor vote: S 466 c1
- Yeas: 7
June 6, 2022: Floor vote: S 466 c1
- Yeas: 20
March 3, 2022: Floor vote: S 466 c2
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor