+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 547 (Ch. 2019-79)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 547
- Read 2nd time
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
- Now in Appropriations
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Education read 1st time
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
326072 - Amendment
Between lines 86 and 87 insert:
256780 - Amendment
Delete lines 48 - 86 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 464 Filed
- Yeas: 8
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 464 c1
- Yeas: 7
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 464 c1
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor