+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 1009.895 -
+ − Vote
June 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 456 Filed
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor