+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
- Introduced
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On November 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On October 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
371170 - Amendment
Delete line 288 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 193.155 - Homestead assessments.
+ − Vote
April 4, 2018: Floor vote: S 454 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor