+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 118 (Ch. 2017-130)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/17, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/06/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
303428 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
719990 - Amendment to Amendment (303428)
Delete line 20 and insert:
480408 - Substitute Amendment (116034)
Delete lines 18 - 40 and insert:
116034 - Amendment
Delete lines 18 - 40 and insert:
576030 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 450 Filed
- Yeas: 6
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 450 c1
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 450 c2
- Yeas: 18
March 13, 2017: Floor vote: S 450 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor