+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
On November 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/16/17, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Judiciary; Rules
On October 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 4, 2018: Floor vote: S 442 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2