+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/17/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
255048 - Amendment
Between lines 61 and 62 insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1013.385 -
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 442 Filed
- Yeas: 11
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 442 Filed
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 442 Filed
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor