+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On November 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/01/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 11/02/15, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
355758 - Amendment
Delete line 96 and insert:
583094 - Amendment
Delete line 100 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 287.0577 -
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 438 Filed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor