+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7055 (Ch. 2018-6)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On November 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Rules
On October 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 1001.10 - Commissioner of Education; general powers and duties.
+ − Vote
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 436 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor