+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 71 (Ch. 2015-131)
- Substituted CS/HB 71
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
- Now in Community Affairs
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
892640 - Amendment
Delete lines 67 - 92 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 413.08 - Rights of an individual with a disability; use of a service animal; discrimination in public employment or housing accommodations; penalties.
+ − Votes (3)
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0414 Filed
- Yeas: 4
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0414 c1
- Yeas: 7
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0414 c1
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor