+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2021-69)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 545
- Read 2nd time
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 5
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Original reference(s) removed: Education
- Remaining references corrected to Rules
- Now in Rules
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Education; Rules
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
July 22, 2021: Floor vote: S 410 Filed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 22, 2021: Floor vote: S 410 c1
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor