+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8013 (Adopted)
- Read 2nd time
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Rules read 1st time
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On October 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
776388 - Title Amendment
In title, delete lines 51 - 53 and insert:
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 398 Filed
- Yeas: 7
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 398 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor