+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 273 (Ch. 2016-20)
- Substituted CS/HB 273
- Read 2nd time
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/28/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/20/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary read 1st time
- Introduced
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On November 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/01/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
On November 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
453772 - Amendment
Delete lines 101 - 118 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 119.0701 - Contracts; public records.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 390 Filed
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 390 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 390 c1
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor