+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6027 (Ch. 2020-168), CS/HB 7039 (Ch. 2020-144)
- Substituted HB 6027
- Read 2nd time
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On November 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/13/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
On October 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules
On September 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 388 Filed
- Yeas: 4
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 388 Filed
- Yeas: 3
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 388 Filed
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor