+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On November 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Education
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Education
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/07/13, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
+ − Amendment
189962 - Amendment
03/06/2013 at 8:26 AM
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor