+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 387 (Ch. 2016-81)
- Substituted HB 387
- Read 2nd time
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/17/16, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/01/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 356 Filed
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 356 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 356 Filed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor