+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Receded from 1 amendment(s) (760753)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- In returning messages
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur, requested House to recede
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 87 NAYS 29
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (760753)
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/HB 531
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received
- Referred to Calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (607408)
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/13
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/21/13, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 03/13/13, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/07/13, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/21/13, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
760753 - Amendment
04/18/2013 at 5:00 PM
607408 - Amendment
04/03/2013 at 4:26 PM
181644 - Amendment
03/13/2013 at 12:28 PM (Late Filed)
+ − Statute Amended
- 196.199 - Government property exemption.
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2013: House floor vote on S 0354 e1
- Yeas: 118
April 4, 2013: Senate floor vote on S 0354 c1
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor