+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Died in returning Messages
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- In returning messages
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (547997)
- Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (300958)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (547997)
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/HB 953
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
- Referred to Calendar
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 24 NAYS 14
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/15/17
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/09/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/21/17, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Ethics and Elections
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Amendments (5)
231029 - Amendment to Amendment (300958)
Remove line 21 and insert:
300958 - S Amend. to H Amend. (547997)
Between lines 20 and 21 insert:
547997 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
423188 - Amendment
Delete lines 64 - 81 and insert:
734950 - Amendment
Delete lines 44 - 87 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 97.029 -
+ − Votes (6)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 352 Filed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 352 Filed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 352 c1
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
May 4, 2017: Floor vote: S 352 c1
- Yeas: 36
April 28, 2017: Floor vote: S 352 c1
- Yeas: 116
March 21, 2017: Floor vote: S 352 c1
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor