+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Appropriations
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 121.055 - Senior Management Service Class.
+ − Vote
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 338 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor